House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 680 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 680 | |
House | 03/02/2023 | Filed |