Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3396 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/03/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R10240 JG-D
 By: Hayes H.B. No. 3396


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the Health and Human Services Commission to
 establish a plan to bring certain funded forensic state hospital
 beds online.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  In this section, "commission" means the
 Health and Human Services Commission.
 (b)  The commission shall develop and implement a plan to
 ensure that each forensic state hospital bed that is funded to
 provide competency restoration services is brought online and
 providing those services not later than August 31, 2024.
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2024, the commission shall
 submit to each standing committee of the legislature with
 jurisdiction over state hospitals a report on the plan established
 by the commission under Subsection (b) of this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act expires December 1, 2024.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.