House | 05/12/2023 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 4064 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) | Journal Page: 4064 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 707 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 707 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Filed |