E
|
06/18/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6492
|
E
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5976
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2994
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5615
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5303
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2458
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2458
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2458
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2458
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3508
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1308
|
Journal Page: 3508
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3508
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3508
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3479
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3479
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 707
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|