Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3436 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 17, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note April 25, 2023