House
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
CSSB 1509
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|