Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1743 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1743 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1623 | |
House | 05/07/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3469 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3301 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1213 | Journal Page: 3300 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3300 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3300 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3209 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Record vote | RV#1169 | Journal Page: 3208 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3208 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Amended | 1-Thimesch | Journal Page: 3207 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3207 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1743 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 713 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Filed |