LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB3565
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3565
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3565
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/04/2023
10:30 am
Elections Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
JHR 120
HB3159
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
HB1980
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2133
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
HB3372
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB3565
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB246
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23