E | 05/27/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/27/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6429 | |
E | 05/16/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4564 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1985 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4384 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4387 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4313 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1891 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1891 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1891 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1891 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1891 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1891 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1890 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1750 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 917 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#161 | Journal Page: 1359 |
House | 04/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1359 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1358 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1336 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1336 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1048 | |
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1033 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 317 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |