House | 05/16/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4387 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 744 | |
House | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 744 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Filed |