LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB3801
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3801
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3801
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/20/2023
8:00 am
Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB554
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB630
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
HB3385
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3801
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB4177
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
HCR26
Introduced
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Signed by the Governor
HJR154
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Left pending in committee