LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB3895
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3895
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3895
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/26/2023
10:30 am
County Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB5394
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2633
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/16/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5375
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
HB5351
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB3895
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB4922
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Local Government
HB1022
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB5359
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Local Government
HB2614
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB4954
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
HB4878
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Local Government
HB3789
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/16/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
HB4495
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Left pending in committee