LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB3900
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3900
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3900
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/11/2023
8:00 am
International Relations & Economic Development Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.026
HB1979
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
HB2598
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
HB2872
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3723
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
HB3900
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
HB4131
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
HB5264
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar