E | 06/12/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/12/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6491 | |
E | 05/28/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6489 | |
Senate | 05/28/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3177 | |
House | 05/26/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5890 | |
House | 05/26/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5975 | |
House | 05/25/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5292 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2589 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2589 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2589 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2589 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2589 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2589 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2589 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2683 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2542 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2540 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2393 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1710 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3860 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3505 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3509 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1308 | Journal Page: 3509 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3509 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3509 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3481 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3481 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1783 | |
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 760 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Filed |