Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 16, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023