E
|
06/13/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6422
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6428
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3001
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5629
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5630
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2156
|
Journal Page: 5630
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5629
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5292
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2541
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#681
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2364
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2364
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|