Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4183 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 21, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 16, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 21, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Bill
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023