Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4183 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2023

                    By: Price, Lujan (Senate Sponsor - Sparks) H.B. No. 4183
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4183 By:  Hinojosa


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HughesX
 JohnsonX
 CreightonX
 HinojosaX
 MiddletonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a waiver of the waiting period for a marriage ceremony.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2.204(c), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  An applicant may request a judge of a court with
 jurisdiction in family law cases, a justice of the supreme court, a
 judge of the court of criminal appeals, a county judge, [or] a judge
 of a court of appeals, an associate judge appointed under Chapter
 201, an associate judge appointed under Chapter 54A, Government
 Code, or a justice of the peace for a written waiver permitting the
 marriage ceremony to take place during the 72-hour period
 immediately following the issuance of the marriage license. If the
 judge, associate judge, or justice finds that there is good cause
 for the marriage to take place during the period, the judge,
 associate judge, or justice shall sign the waiver. Notwithstanding
 any other provision of law, a judge, associate judge, or justice
 under this section has the authority to sign a waiver under this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a marriage ceremony for which a marriage license application is
 filed on or after the effective date of this Act. A marriage
 ceremony for which a marriage license application is filed before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on
 the date the application was filed, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *