House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 987 | |
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 322 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 322 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |