Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1744 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1744 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1606 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2946 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#1010 | Journal Page: 2946 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2946 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2946 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2870 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Amended | 1-Lozano | Journal Page: 2870 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2869 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2048 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1744 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 800 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |