Senate | 05/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1602 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1602 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1549 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2824 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | RV#936 | Journal Page: 2823 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2823 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2823 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2195 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1602 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 800 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |