Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1921 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1921 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1871 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4120 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1596 | Journal Page: 4120 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4120 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4120 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3995 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1555 | Journal Page: 3994 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3994 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Amendment adopted as amended | 1-Lozano | Journal Page: 3994 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Amendment amended | 2-Lozano | Journal Page: 3993 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Lozano | Journal Page: 3992 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3992 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1935 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1921 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1921 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |