House | 05/12/2023 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 4068 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) | Journal Page: 4068 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 824 | |
House | 03/22/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 824 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |