Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4579 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/21/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Walle (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 4579
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KingX
 BirdwellX
 CampbellX
 CreightonX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 NicholsX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of employment compensation by certain state
 agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 659.082, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A state agency listed in Subsection (a) may elect to pay
 employment compensation twice a month to an employee who holds a
 position classified in salary group A12, A13, A14, A15, A16, or A17
 under classification salary Schedule A in the General
 Appropriations Act. A state agency that elects to pay employment
 compensation twice a month under this subsection must satisfy the
 comptroller's requirements relating to the payment of compensation
 twice a month.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *