Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1711 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3860 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3595 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1361 | Journal Page: 3594 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3594 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3594 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3455 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1295 | Journal Page: 3454 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3454 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3454 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2577 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1783 | |
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Community Safety, Select | Journal Page: 831 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |