1 | 1 | | 88R13997 CJC-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Hayes H.B. No. 4654 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to providing for a reduction in the total number of state |
---|
8 | 8 | | agency rules. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 2001, Government Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 2001.008 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 2001.008. REQUIREMENT TO REDUCE NUMBER OF RULES. (a) |
---|
13 | 13 | | Not later than January 1, 2024, each state agency shall determine |
---|
14 | 14 | | the total number of rules adopted by the agency under this chapter |
---|
15 | 15 | | or other law that are in effect on that date and post that number in |
---|
16 | 16 | | a conspicuous location on the agency's Internet website, along with |
---|
17 | 17 | | an explanation that the number represents the current total number |
---|
18 | 18 | | of rules of that agency. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (b) Any person may challenge the number of rules determined |
---|
20 | 20 | | by a state agency under Subsection (a) by providing written notice |
---|
21 | 21 | | of the challenge to the agency not later than March 1, 2024. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (c) Not later than April 1, 2024, a state agency that |
---|
23 | 23 | | receives written notice of a challenge under Subsection (b) shall: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) approve the challenge and adjust the posting |
---|
25 | 25 | | required under Subsection (a) to reflect the correct number of |
---|
26 | 26 | | rules; or |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) disapprove the challenge and forward the written |
---|
28 | 28 | | notice to the standing committee of each house of the legislature |
---|
29 | 29 | | with primary jurisdiction over the agency. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (d) Not later than June 1, 2024, a standing committee to |
---|
31 | 31 | | which a challenge is forwarded under Subsection (c) shall: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (1) approve the challenge and order the state agency |
---|
33 | 33 | | to which the challenge relates to adjust the posting required under |
---|
34 | 34 | | Subsection (a) to reflect the correct number of rules; or |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) disapprove the challenge and affirm the number of |
---|
36 | 36 | | rules posted by the agency under Subsection (a). |
---|
37 | 37 | | (e) Not later than August 1, 2024, each state agency shall |
---|
38 | 38 | | identify a number of rules equal to 10 percent of the number of |
---|
39 | 39 | | rules posted by the agency under Subsection (a) that the agency will |
---|
40 | 40 | | repeal. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (f) Not later than October 1, 2024, each state agency shall |
---|
42 | 42 | | repeal the rules identified by the agency under Subsection (e). |
---|
43 | 43 | | (g) This section expires December 31, 2024. |
---|
44 | 44 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|