88R13997 CJC-D By: Hayes H.B. No. 4654 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to providing for a reduction in the total number of state agency rules. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 2001, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 2001.008 to read as follows: Sec. 2001.008. REQUIREMENT TO REDUCE NUMBER OF RULES. (a) Not later than January 1, 2024, each state agency shall determine the total number of rules adopted by the agency under this chapter or other law that are in effect on that date and post that number in a conspicuous location on the agency's Internet website, along with an explanation that the number represents the current total number of rules of that agency. (b) Any person may challenge the number of rules determined by a state agency under Subsection (a) by providing written notice of the challenge to the agency not later than March 1, 2024. (c) Not later than April 1, 2024, a state agency that receives written notice of a challenge under Subsection (b) shall: (1) approve the challenge and adjust the posting required under Subsection (a) to reflect the correct number of rules; or (2) disapprove the challenge and forward the written notice to the standing committee of each house of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over the agency. (d) Not later than June 1, 2024, a standing committee to which a challenge is forwarded under Subsection (c) shall: (1) approve the challenge and order the state agency to which the challenge relates to adjust the posting required under Subsection (a) to reflect the correct number of rules; or (2) disapprove the challenge and affirm the number of rules posted by the agency under Subsection (a). (e) Not later than August 1, 2024, each state agency shall identify a number of rules equal to 10 percent of the number of rules posted by the agency under Subsection (a) that the agency will repeal. (f) Not later than October 1, 2024, each state agency shall repeal the rules identified by the agency under Subsection (e). (g) This section expires December 31, 2024. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.