1 | 1 | | By: Schofield (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 4659 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water, |
---|
4 | 4 | | Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by |
---|
5 | 5 | | the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to a study of the financing of regional facilities that |
---|
12 | 12 | | convert groundwater to surface water. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. DEFINITIONS. In this Act: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) "Board" means the Texas Water Development Board. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) "Facility" means a regional water facility that |
---|
17 | 17 | | converts groundwater to surface water. |
---|
18 | 18 | | SECTION 2. WORKING GROUP. (a) A working group composed of |
---|
19 | 19 | | representatives of the Texas Water Development Board and the Texas |
---|
20 | 20 | | Public Finance Authority is formed to study, review, and report to |
---|
21 | 21 | | the legislature on the methods used to finance or refinance |
---|
22 | 22 | | regional water facilities that convert groundwater to surface |
---|
23 | 23 | | water. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (b) The working group may include representatives of local |
---|
25 | 25 | | governments of Harris and Fort Bend Counties that have borrowed |
---|
26 | 26 | | money from the board for a facility. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (c) The chair of the board, or a designee of the chair of the |
---|
28 | 28 | | board, shall serve as the chair of the working group. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (d) The working group shall convene at the call of the |
---|
30 | 30 | | chair. |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 3. STUDY. The working group shall study: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (1) the useful life of regional water facilities that |
---|
33 | 33 | | convert groundwater to surface water, including associated |
---|
34 | 34 | | improvements during a facility's useful life; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) the typical period of time necessary to pay the |
---|
36 | 36 | | costs associated with developing a financed facility; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (3) the economic effect on current water users paying |
---|
38 | 38 | | the cost of a facility that will provide service to future water |
---|
39 | 39 | | users; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (4) the financing terms of current and anticipated |
---|
41 | 41 | | facilities; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (5) the ability to distribute the costs associated |
---|
43 | 43 | | with the development of a facility to the users who benefit from the |
---|
44 | 44 | | facility, including: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (A) the fairness and equity benefits to water |
---|
46 | 46 | | users of extending the financing of a facility compared to the |
---|
47 | 47 | | potential increase in financing costs associated with an extension |
---|
48 | 48 | | of financing; |
---|
49 | 49 | | (B) the ability to use methods of financing or |
---|
50 | 50 | | refinancing to accomplish this distribution; |
---|
51 | 51 | | (C) policies and procedures of this state and the |
---|
52 | 52 | | board that may be used to accomplish this distribution; |
---|
53 | 53 | | (D) whether the board's financing terms and |
---|
54 | 54 | | conditions can be improved to better accomplish this distribution, |
---|
55 | 55 | | including whether the board may forgive a loan or a portion of a |
---|
56 | 56 | | loan to better accomplish this distribution; |
---|
57 | 57 | | (E) whether potential measures that could |
---|
58 | 58 | | accomplish this distribution are precluded by state law; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | (F) what changes to state law may be necessary to |
---|
60 | 60 | | accomplish this distribution; |
---|
61 | 61 | | (6) whether financial assistance administered by the |
---|
62 | 62 | | board may be used to refinance or restructure existing financing of |
---|
63 | 63 | | a facility; and |
---|
64 | 64 | | (7) whether a facility is eligible for grant funding. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 4. FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (a) The working |
---|
66 | 66 | | group shall recommend any changes and improvements relating to the |
---|
67 | 67 | | financing of regional facilities that convert groundwater to |
---|
68 | 68 | | surface water that may be implemented by this state, the board, or |
---|
69 | 69 | | another state agency without further legislative authorization. |
---|
70 | 70 | | (b) Not later than September 1, 2024, the working group |
---|
71 | 71 | | shall report the working group's findings and recommendations to |
---|
72 | 72 | | the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of |
---|
73 | 73 | | representatives, and the governor. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (c) A member of the house or the senate may request to be |
---|
75 | 75 | | kept informed of the working group's progress throughout the |
---|
76 | 76 | | duration of the study. |
---|
77 | 77 | | SECTION 5. EXPIRATION. This Act expires September 1, 2025. |
---|
78 | 78 | | SECTION 6. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
79 | 79 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
80 | 80 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
81 | 81 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
82 | 82 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
83 | 83 | | * * * * * |
---|