Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4659 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Schofield (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 4659
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study of the financing of regional facilities that
 convert groundwater to surface water.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Board" means the Texas Water Development Board.
 (2)  "Facility" means a regional water facility that
 converts groundwater to surface water.
 SECTION 2.  WORKING GROUP. (a)  A working group composed of
 representatives of the Texas Water Development Board and the Texas
 Public Finance Authority is formed to study, review, and report to
 the legislature on the methods used to finance or refinance
 regional water facilities that convert groundwater to surface
 water.
 (b)  The working group may include representatives of local
 governments of Harris and Fort Bend Counties that have borrowed
 money from the board for a facility.
 (c)  The chair of the board, or a designee of the chair of the
 board, shall serve as the chair of the working group.
 (d)  The working group shall convene at the call of the
 chair.
 SECTION 3.  STUDY. The working group shall study:
 (1)  the useful life of regional water facilities that
 convert groundwater to surface water, including associated
 improvements during a facility's useful life;
 (2)  the typical period of time necessary to pay the
 costs associated with developing a financed facility;
 (3)  the economic effect on current water users paying
 the cost of a facility that will provide service to future water
 users;
 (4)  the financing terms of current and anticipated
 facilities;
 (5)  the ability to distribute the costs associated
 with the development of a facility to the users who benefit from the
 facility, including:
 (A)  the fairness and equity benefits to water
 users of extending the financing of a facility compared to the
 potential increase in financing costs associated with an extension
 of financing;
 (B)  the ability to use methods of financing or
 refinancing to accomplish this distribution;
 (C)  policies and procedures of this state and the
 board that may be used to accomplish this distribution;
 (D)  whether the board's financing terms and
 conditions can be improved to better accomplish this distribution,
 including whether the board may forgive a loan or a portion of a
 loan to better accomplish this distribution;
 (E)  whether potential measures that could
 accomplish this distribution are precluded by state law; and
 (F)  what changes to state law may be necessary to
 accomplish this distribution;
 (6)  whether financial assistance administered by the
 board may be used to refinance or restructure existing financing of
 a facility; and
 (7)  whether a facility is eligible for grant funding.
 SECTION 4.  FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (a)  The working
 group shall recommend any changes and improvements relating to the
 financing of regional facilities that convert groundwater to
 surface water that may be implemented by this state, the board, or
 another state agency without further legislative authorization.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2024, the working group
 shall report the working group's findings and recommendations to
 the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the governor.
 (c)  A member of the house or the senate may request to be
 kept informed of the working group's progress throughout the
 duration of the study.
 SECTION 5.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 6.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *