E
|
05/23/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5303
|
E
|
05/11/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3710
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3467
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1638
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1638
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1638
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1638
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1638
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1638
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1637
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#390
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 325
|
House
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|