Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4714 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 27, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 22, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 22, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023