E
|
06/13/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6485
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6488
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5895
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3008
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3008
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2135
|
Journal Page: 5548
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5547
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2681
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2260
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2189
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2189
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2189
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4710
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4710
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4710
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1750
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1035
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#250
|
Journal Page: 1556
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1556
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1556
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1521
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1521
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 325
|
House
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|