Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4770 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/04/2023 2:00 pm
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23