Senate | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1960 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1960 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1872 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4318 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4103 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1581 | Journal Page: 4102 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4102 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4102 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3934 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3934 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 3862 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3846 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1481 | Journal Page: 3845 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3845 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3845 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1960 | |
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 842 | |
House | 03/10/2023 | Filed |