E
|
06/17/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4826
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4835
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2030
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4527
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1810
|
Journal Page: 4527
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4386
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hancock
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1927
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#402
|
Journal Page: 1812
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1812
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Romero
|
Journal Page: 1812
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Romero
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1636
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|