Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4797 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

                    By: Romero, Jr., et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 4797
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2023;
 May 1, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to training on the treatment of toll project roadways
 during inclement weather.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 372, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 372.059 to read as follows:
 Sec. 372.059.  TREATMENT OF TOLL ROADWAY DURING INCLEMENT
 WEATHER. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (e), a toll project
 entity that treats a roadway maintained by the entity during icy or
 snowy weather shall require each employee or contractor who
 develops and supervises a plan for roadway treatment to complete a
 training course on treating roadways during icy or snowy weather in
 the same manner as a department employee who treats roadways during
 icy or snowy weather.
 (b)  The department, in coordination with public toll
 project entities:
 (1)  shall make training courses that the department
 provides to department employees who develop and supervise plans
 for roadway treatment available to a person required to receive
 training under Subsection (a); and
 (2)  may adopt rules as necessary to implement this
 section.
 (c)  The department, in coordination with toll project
 entities, shall identify the types of employees and contractors who
 are subject to the training requirements under Subsection (a).
 (d)  A training course described by Subsection (b) must
 include instruction regarding:
 (1)  prioritizing treatment of elevated structures and
 other roadway elements that pose the highest risk to public health
 and safety during icy or snowy weather;
 (2)  timing of treatment of roadways during icy or
 snowy weather; and
 (3)  treatment of general purpose lanes adjacent to a
 toll project.
 (e)  The department may authorize a toll project entity to
 require that an employee or contractor required to receive training
 under Subsection (a) complete a training course provided by another
 entity that includes substantially the same information as a course
 provided by the department.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *