Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4820 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Orr, Burns (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 4820
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 11, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility requirements for grants under programs
 of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5.124(f), Water Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (f)  A grant may be made by direct award only if:
 (1)  the executive director determines that:
 (A)  selection of recipients by the solicitation
 of proposals or applications is not feasible; and
 (B)  awarding the grant directly is in the best
 interest of the state;
 (2)  eligibility for the grant is limited to:
 (A)  an agency or political subdivision of this
 state or of another state;
 (B)  a state institution of higher learning of
 this state or of another state, including any part or service of the
 institution; [or]
 (C)  an agency of the United States; or
 (D)  a nonprofit organization and the grant is
 awarded for the purpose of funding projects implementing a
 comprehensive conservation and management plan under the Federal
 Water Pollution Control Act (33 U.S.C. Section 1251 et seq.) for a
 national estuary located in this state; or
 (3)  the grant is awarded to a person established or
 authorized to develop or implement a comprehensive conservation and
 management plan under Section 320, Federal Water Pollution Control
 Act (33 U.S.C. Section 1330), for a national estuary in this state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *