Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4919 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/04/2023 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services