E
|
06/13/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6492
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6485
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6488
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3013
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5831
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5832
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2182
|
Journal Page: 5831
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5831
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5293
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2739
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2739
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2739
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Birdwell
|
Journal Page: 2739
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2739
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2739
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3604
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1369
|
Journal Page: 3604
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote RV#1369
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3604
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3464
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Amended
|
3-Clardy
|
Journal Page: 3463
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Amended 3-Clardy
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3460
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/8/23 5:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3442
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3442
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 871
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|