LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB5068
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB5068
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB5068
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/12/2023
8:00 am
Agriculture & Livestock Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.026
HB2818
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB3361
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB3945
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB4609
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
HB5225
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Transportation
HB5250
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
HB5068
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule