LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB5241
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB5241
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB5241
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/19/2023
8:00 am
Appropriations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.030
HB387
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
HB626
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Finance
HB1794
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
HB3258
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Finance
HB5241
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H No action taken in committee