House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1397 | Journal Page: 3668 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3668 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 3668 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3667 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Motion fails | Journal Page: 3667 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Motion to postpone | Journal Page: 3667 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3667 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Postponed | 5/9/23 10:00 PM | Journal Page: 3641 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Postponed | 5/9/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3457 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3457 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3074 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 898 | |
House | 03/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 898 | |
House | 03/10/2023 | Filed |