Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence