LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB5401
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB5401
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB5401
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/02/2023
8:00 am
Natural Resources Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.010
SB1250
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
HB5401
Introduced
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB5405
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
HB5409
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately