House | 05/25/2023 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 5896 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1960 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1960 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1874 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4318 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4098 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1580 | Journal Page: 4098 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4098 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4098 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4075 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4075 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3468 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1960 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 1923 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Filed |