Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 6, 2023
Analysis May 6, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2023
Bill May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2023