LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB5403
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB5403
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB5403
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/05/2023
9:00 am
County Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB257
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB318
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB439
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB1815
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
HB2085
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Local Government
HB2617
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
HB3590
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5403
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)