Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB560 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 04/14/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R2729 SCP-D
 By: Raymond H.B. No. 560


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to analyzing and mitigating transportation security
 threats in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Public Safety Commission.
 (2)  "Department" means the Department of Public Safety
 of the State of Texas.
 (3)  "Director" means the public safety director.
 (4)  "Division" means the Intelligence and
 Counterterrorism division of the department.
 SECTION 2.  TRANSPORTATION SECURITY THREAT ANALYSIS. (a)
 The division shall conduct an analysis of emerging and potential
 future threats to transportation security in this state. The
 analysis must include emerging and potential future threats posed
 by the following:
 (1)  evolving tactics by terrorist organizations that
 may pose a catastrophic risk to an aviation or surface
 transportation entity;
 (2)  explosive devices or attacks involving the use of
 explosives that may cause catastrophic damage to an aviation or
 surface transportation system;
 (3)  the release of chemical or biological agents in
 either aviation or surface transportation systems;
 (4)  cyberthreat actors seeking to undermine
 confidence in transportation systems or cause service disruptions
 that jeopardize transportation security;
 (5)  unmanned aerial systems with the capability of
 inflicting harm on transportation targets;
 (6)  individuals or groups seeking to attack soft
 targets, public areas, or crowded spaces of transportation systems,
 including attacks against transportation security personnel;
 (7)  foreign actors seeking to exploit vulnerabilities
 posed by inconsistent or inadequate security screening protocols at
 last point of departure airports with direct flights to this state;
 (8)  information-sharing challenges within state
 government and between state government and private and
 governmental entities; and
 (9)  growth in passenger volume in both the aviation
 and surface transportation sectors in this state.
 (b)  In conducting the analysis required under Subsection
 (a) of this section, the division shall engage transportation
 stakeholders and account for security concerns of transportation
 operators by:
 (1)  convening at least three industry day events for
 transportation stakeholders to hear from relevant public and
 private sector security partners and provide feedback on emerging
 threats identified by the transportation stakeholders;
 (2)  developing strategies to solicit feedback on a
 consistent basis from transportation stakeholders across all modes
 of transportation and providing consistent responses to
 stakeholder concerns;
 (3)  improving the quality, timeliness, and relevancy
 of information-sharing products disseminated by the division to
 transportation stakeholders, including classified
 information-sharing products;
 (4)  coordinating security incident response and
 communications drills, including tabletop exercises, to improve
 incident preparedness and response capabilities across
 transportation modes and among transportation systems;
 (5)  encouraging regular communication between
 governmental entities responsible for transportation security and
 transportation stakeholders; and
 (6)  establishing regular opportunities for senior
 department leadership to engage with transportation stakeholders
 regarding changes in the threat environment and ways the department
 can offer security support to address those changes.
 (c)  Not later than June 1, 2024, the division shall submit
 the analysis required under Subsection (a) of this section to the
 commission and director.
 SECTION 3.  MITIGATION. Not later than October 1, 2024, the
 director shall:
 (1)  develop, as appropriate, a threat mitigation
 strategy for each of the threats examined in the analysis; and
 (2)  assign appropriate department resources to
 address those threats based on the calculated risk or provide
 recommendations to the appropriate governmental entity responsible
 for addressing those threats.
 SECTION 4.  REPORT TO THE LEGISLATURE. Not later than
 December 1, 2024, the director shall provide a written report to
 each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over
 transportation on the results of the analysis required under
 Section 2 of this Act and relevant mitigation strategies developed
 in accordance with Section 3 of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires December 31, 2024.
 SECTION 6.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September
 1, 2023.