LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB584
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB584
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB584
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/04/2023
8:30 am
Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.028
HB473
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
HB584
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1912
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2871
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Left pending in committee
HB3993
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1297
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2484
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
SB2518
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
03/30/2023
House Supplemental Calendar Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
HB727
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
HB584
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB624
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB28
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/29/2023
House Daily Calendar Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
HB727
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
HB584
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB624
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB28
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/29/2023
House Supplemental Calendar Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
HB446
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB300
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
HB590
Engrossed
Last Action: 03/30/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB608
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB727
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
HB584
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB624
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB28
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/15/2023
10:30 am
State Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
JHR 140
HB390
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB537
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Considered in Calendars
HB584
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB821
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
HB1500
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1817
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
HB2033
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB2127
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23