Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB609 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 27, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 2, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 5, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023